Mosley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Antonio Mosley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2023cv00439
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Concerning Consent to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/12/24. (rtc)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs and Scheduling Oral Argument. Social Security Hearing set for 4/17/2024 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/12/24. (rtc)
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SSA Transcript pt 2, #2 Exhibit SSA Transcript pt 3) (Benedict, Joseph)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Luke Benedict on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Benedict, Joseph)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/16/23. (rrh)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 AO 240, #3 EAJA Limited Power of Attorney) (jla)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Antonio Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
November 16, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Mosley
Represented By: Joe Morgan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: USA
Represented By: Joseph Luke Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?