Nicholas Services, LLC et al v. Glassdoor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas Services, LLC doing business as Nicholas Air and Corr Flight S., Inc.
Defendant: Glassdoor, Inc., John and Jane Doe(s) 1-30 and Glassdoor, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00448
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE re #33 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
January 25, 2024 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Corr Flight S., Inc., Nicholas Services, LLC. (Gault, Edwin) Modified on 1/26/2024 to link to underlying motion (jla).
January 25, 2024 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California filed by Corr Flight S., Inc., Nicholas Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Glassdoor Help Center, #2 Exhibit B - Glassdoor Premium Employer Products, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Glassdoor to Nicholas Air, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Peder von Harten, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Fernando Pineda) (Gault, Edwin)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply to Response re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California by Glassdoor, LLC. Response due by 1/26/2024. Reply due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/19/2024. (spw)
January 19, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California by Corr Flight S., Inc., Nicholas Services, LLC. (Gault, Edwin)
January 18, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher R. Edgar on behalf of Glassdoor, LLC (Edgar, Christopher)
January 18, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William J. Frimel on behalf of Glassdoor, LLC (Frimel, William)
January 9, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Glassdoor, Inc. by Edwin S. Gault, Jr on behalf of Corr Flight S., Inc., Nicholas Services, LLC (Gault, Edwin)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney William J. Frimel & granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Christopher R. Edgar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/8/24. (rrh)
January 8, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Glassdoor, Inc. (jla)
January 5, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Christopher Ramsey Edgar,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2339082) by Glassdoor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mallette, Pope)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney William Joseph Frimel,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2339076) by Glassdoor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mallette, Pope)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California filed by Glassdoor, LLC. (Mallette, Pope)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California by Glassdoor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Annie Khalid, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of William J. Frimel) (Mallette, Pope)
January 5, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Mauldin on behalf of Glassdoor, LLC (Mauldin, John)
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pope S. Mallette on behalf of Glassdoor, LLC (Mallette, Pope)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Withdraw #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California and Extend Response Deadlines. Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #13 on or before January 5, 2024. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/27/2023. (spw)
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California and Extend Response Deadlines by Corr Flight S., Inc., Nicholas Services, LLC. (Gault, Edwin)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Services, LLC d/b/a Nicholas Air. (Gault, Edwin)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Corr Flight S., Inc. . (Gault, Edwin)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California. Responses due by 12/29/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/14/2023. (lgm)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California by Corr Flight S., Inc., Nicholas Services, LLC. (Gault, Edwin)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Nicholas Services, LLC, Corr Flight S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Negative Reviews, #2 Exhibit B - Agreements, #3 Exhibit C - Ratings, #4 Exhibit D - Questionnaire) (Gault, Edwin)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Molly H. McNair on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McNair, Molly)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edwin S. Gault, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gault, Edwin)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Summons Issued, #5 Filing Fee Receipt, #6 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal or Motion for Protective Order, #7 Summons Issued, #8 Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued, #9 Notice of Removal with Exhibit) (Mallette, Pope)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice - Wendi Litton (jwr)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 1/9/24 re #7 Order Staying Case (no document attached) (rtc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/23. (rrh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California filed by Glassdoor, Inc.. (Mallette, Pope)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer this Action to the Northern District of California by Glassdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Annie Khalid, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of William J. Frimel) (Mallette, Pope)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2024 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/29/23. (rtc)
November 29, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE AS TO NICHOLAS SERVICES, LLC and CORR FLIGHT S., INC. : F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event "Disclosure Statement" to file the required statement. (jwr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Glassdoor, Inc. (jwr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicholas Services, LLC, Corr Flight S., Inc. (jwr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Glassdoor, Inc. from Circuit Court of Lafayette County, Mississippi, case number L23-306. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2326850) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Glassdoor, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Report, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
November 28, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Services, LLC et al v. Glassdoor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Services, LLC doing business as Nicholas Air
Represented By: Hannah Katherine Herrin
Represented By: Molly H. McNair
Represented By: Edwin S. Gault, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corr Flight S., Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Katherine Herrin
Represented By: Molly H. McNair
Represented By: Edwin S. Gault, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glassdoor, Inc.
Represented By: John Andrew Mauldin
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe(s) 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glassdoor, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Edgar
Represented By: John Andrew Mauldin
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Represented By: William J. Frimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?