Jones v. Quitman County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Jones
Defendant: Quitman County, Mississippi, Sheriff Oliver Parker, Jr. and John and Jane Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2023cv00455
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Core Disclosures by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary)
January 24, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Confidential Case Memorandum and Plaintiffs Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Jefferson D. Gilder on behalf of Kendra Jones to Defendants. (Gilder, Jefferson)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, & Requests for Admissions by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi of Intent of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon Mississippi Department of Public Safety, Mississippi Bureau of Investigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena Duces Tecum) (Griffith, Mary) Modified on 1/19/2024 (jla).
January 14, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA Duces Tecum served on Office of State Medical Examiner on 12/29/2023 by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Mary)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi of Intent of Subpoena Duces Tecum to MS Medical Examiner's Office (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena Duces Tecum) (Griffith, Mary)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 1/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/27/23. (irw)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to State Court Complaint #2 by Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Mary)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Summons Issued, #4 Exhibit 4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 Proof of Service of Summons Returned Executed, #6 Exhibit 6 Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit 7 Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit 8 Waiver of Service of Summons, #9 Exhibit 9 Notice of Removal) (Griffith, Mary)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Complaint; Oliver Parker, Jr answer due 1/5/2024; Quitman County, Mississippi answer due 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/7/23. (jla)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Mary)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi (Griffith, Mary)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John and Jane Does 1-100, Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi, filed by Kendra Jones. (jla)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi from Quitman County Circuit Court, case number 2023-0051. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2327469) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Oliver Parker, Jr, Quitman County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Issued, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Quitman County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Jones
Represented By: Jefferson D. Gilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quitman County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Oliver Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?