Gooden v. Horn et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Gooden, Jr.
Defendant: David Horn and Western Express, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv00072
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Eugene M. Bogen
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motions in Limine. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 4/16/2009. (pbs, USDC)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims for failure to train and res ipsa loquitur against Western Express are dismissed. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 1/29/2009. (pbs, USDC)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 70 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 12/15/08. (pwh, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooden v. Horn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Gooden, Jr.
Represented By: Yancy Brian Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Horn
Represented By: William H. Gillon, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Gillon, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?