Doss et al v. NPC International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monique Doss and Nadia Harris
Defendant: NPC International, Inc., A & D Management Co., LLC and Shane Brown
Case Number: 4:2009cv00038
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Leflore
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 119 jUDGMENT Dismissing Case. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 2/24/2011. (lpm)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. Signed by David A. Sanders on 2/22/2011. Associated Cases: 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00017-MPM -DAS (sef)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Affirming (109 in 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 96 in 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 47 in 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 45 in 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 28 in 4:10-cv-00017-MPM-DAS) Order and Reversing date of payment. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 10/7/2010. Associated Cases: 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00017-MPM-DAS(lpm, USDC)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. Plaintiffs' counsel shall pay Rule 11 sanction to the clerk of court on or before October 4, 2010. Signed by David A. Sanders on 9/22/10. Associated Cases: 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00017-MPM-DAS(ncb, USDC)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REVERSING and REMANDING for determination of what sanctions are appropriate.. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 7/29/2010. Associated Cases: 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00017-MPM-DAS(lpm, USDC)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (76) Motion to Strike in case 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS. Signed by David A. Sanders on 7/20/10. Associated Cases: 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00017-MPM-DAS (DAS)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 69 Motion in camera review. Defendant to submit detailed explanation of costs and expenses no later than June 14, 2010.. Signed by David A. Sanders on 6/10/2010. (sef)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER for Rule 11 sanctions. Signed by David A. Sanders on 5/14/10. Associated Cases: 4:09-cv-00038-MPM-DAS, 4:09-cv-00076-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00002-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00003-MPM-DAS, 4:10-cv-00017-SA-DAS(ncb, USDC)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by David A. Sanders on 3/23/2010. (sef)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 1/27/2010. (lpm, USDC)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by David A. Sanders on 9/17/09. (ncb, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss et al v. NPC International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Doss
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Harris
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPC International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & D Management Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Brown
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?