New v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Rose New
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2013cv00013
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Washington
Referring Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt 9 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/8/2014. (psk)
December 23, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 12/23/2014. (lmf)
June 14, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 6 and DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED IFP 2 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/14/2013. (psk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose New
Represented By: Susan Carole Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.