Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Stone Pony Pizza, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Stone Pony Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00092
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Coahoma
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 FINAL JUDGMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/16/17. (tab)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER Imposing Sanctions re 287 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/31/2017. (dbm)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER adopting in part and modifying in part Report and Recommendations 272 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/29/2016. (dbm)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 258 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/28/2016. (dbm)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting 252 Motion to Vacate. Case is hereby REOPENED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/30/2015. (psk)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER directing attendance at depositions scheduled to occur on Saturday, March 15, 2014. Signed by Jane M Virden on 03/14/2014. (lec)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT and denying 55 Motion to Strike. Signed by Jane M Virden on 1/10/14. (ncb)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Intervene. The instant motion is DENIED without prejudice to movants right to reurge the motion within seven (7) days of this date. Signed by Jane M Virden on 11/20/13. (ncb)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Intervene. Movants shall file their proposed complaint within 7 days of this date. Signed by Jane M Virden on 8/9/13. (ncb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Stone Pony Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Joseph M. Crout
Represented By: Markeisha Katara Savage
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Pony Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?