Cartwright v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nakenya Cartwright
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Companies, Valerie Sproull and John Does A, B, and C
Case Number: 4:2014cv00057
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Bolivar
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 93 Order on Motion for Judgment NOV, Order on Motion for New Trial. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/15/17. (rel)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of State Farm Insurance Companies, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Nakenya Cartwright. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/20/17. (rel)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 69 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/1/16. (tab)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 58 Order on Motion to establish jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/15/15. (tab)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER LIFTING STAY. The stay in this case is hereby LIFTED, and a case management conference will be set by further notice of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/9/2014. (lec)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 28 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/8/14. (tab)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER terminating as premature 9 Motion to Sever. Defendant may re-urge the motion in the event the Motion to Remand is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 06/09/2014. (lec)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 05/19/2014. (lec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartwright v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakenya Cartwright
Represented By: Robert Brittain Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins
Represented By: Lawrence John Tucker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins
Represented By: Lawrence John Tucker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Sproull
Represented By: Richard Lee Kimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A, B, and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?