Griffin v. HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lakisha Rochelle Griffin
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, American Security Insurance, Co., Assurant, Inc., LSI Real Estate Tax, Corelogic Services, Corestar Financial Group, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Merscorp Holdings, Inc., John Does Affiliates for Corestar Financial Group 1-5, John Does Insurance Defendants 6-10, Fees and Charges Defendants 16-20, HSBC John Does 21-25, Other John Does 26-30, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Ameriprise Insurance Company, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange and John Does Services
Case Number: 4:2014cv00132
Filed: September 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting 328 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/19/17. (ncb)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Dismissing with Prejudice Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Merscorp Holdings, Inc.; denying as moot 249 Motion To Escrow Funds; granting 322 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/22/16. (jtm)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting 280 Motion for Entry of Agreed Order on ASIC's Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/15/16. (ncb)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 236 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/6/16. (ncb)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 149 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/18/16. (tab)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 51 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/1/15. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. HSBC Mortgage Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Rochelle Griffin
Represented By: George F. Hollowell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Represented By: Christopher D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance, Co.
Represented By: Amanda B. Barbour
Represented By: Charles E. Griffin
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda B. Barbour
Represented By: Charles E. Griffin
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Real Estate Tax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic Services
Represented By: George D. Hembree, III
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corestar Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: C. Meade Hartfield
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Clarence Lee Lott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: C. Meade Hartfield
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Clarence Lee Lott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Affiliates for Corestar Financial Group 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Insurance Defendants 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fees and Charges Defendants 16-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC John Does 21-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other John Does 26-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: C. Meade Hartfield
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Clarence Lee Lott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Roy Clay Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?