Reed v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Ray Reed
Defendant: Patrick Johnson, Zakiya Fields, City of Shelby, MS Police Department and A. Williams
Case Number: 4:2014cv00176
Filed: October 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Bolivar
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 76 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/25/2017. (adm)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 58 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/9/2016. (geb)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/4/2016. (geb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Gary E. Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas Francis Morisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zakiya Fields
Represented By: William Eugene Grubbs
Represented By: John Denson Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shelby, MS Police Department
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Gary E. Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas Francis Morisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Williams
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Gary E. Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas Francis Morisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?