Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Hill
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Purvis William Hill, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00166
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Coahoma
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/23/2020. (jtm)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER finding Candace Williamson in civil contempt; immediately suspending Williamson from practicing in the Northern District of Mississippi; and directing Williamson to show cause. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/17/2020. (jwr)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Approving Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company's fee request. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/10/2020. (jtm)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 123 Motion for Contempt. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/26/2019. (jwr)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER for Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company to submit additional evidence and briefing within fourteen (14) days. Williamson may respond on or before October 29, 2019. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/8/2019. (jwr)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER CANCELLING HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/16/19. (ncb)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER requiring in-person attendance at hearing and additional briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/2/19. (ncb)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/14/18. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV (tab)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting (114) Motion to Dismiss; granting (118) Motion to Strike in case 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV; dismissing with prejudice claims asserted on behalf of Hill's estate, and order to show cause. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/10/18. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (tab)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER that defendants are directed to respond to within 14 days of issuance of this order; Mass Mutual may reply within 7 days of filing of response re (106 in 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV) MOTION to Dismiss (MassMutual's Response to Court' ;s December 6, 2017 Order and Renewed Motion to Dismiss) filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, (100 in 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV) MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/5/18. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (tab)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (79) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV; denying (72) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/6/17. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (tab)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting (100) Motion substitution of party in case 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV; granting (93) Motion substitution of party in case 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/7/17. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (ncb)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/31/17. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (jtm)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/12/17. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (ncb)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/26/17. (ncb)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Approving In Part Fees and Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/4/17. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (ncb)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (69) Motion for Entry of an Order to Show Cause in case 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (62) Motion for Entry of an Order to Show Cause in case 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/17/2017. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (bbf)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. Ms. Williamson is directed to file a status report by January 24, 2017, and shall file an updated report every 21 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/20/17. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV (ncb)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 58 Motion for continued status reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/18/17. (ncb)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER entered that counsel of record for the decedent file a declaration in this case within 14 days of this order (53) Motion in case 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV; entered (46) Motion in case 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/15/16. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-00184-DMB-JMV, 4:15-cv-00166-DMB-JMV (tab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Clifford K. Bailey, III
Represented By: Kristen S. Cross
Represented By: Roy H. Liddell
Represented By: James S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purvis William Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Gwendolyn Baptist Hewlett
Represented By: Candace Lenette Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?