Welch v. Prop Transport & Trading, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dewey Welch
Defendant: Prop Transport & Trading, Inc., Greenville Port Commission and Terral Riverservice, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00187
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/17/2017. (bbf)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/1/2017. (bbf)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/10/17. (ncb)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/1/2016. (bbf)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/30/2016. (bbf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Prop Transport & Trading, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewey Welch
Represented By: Joseph Peirce Beach
Represented By: Gaines S. Dyer
Represented By: C. W. Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prop Transport & Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville Port Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terral Riverservice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?