Cooper et al v. Meritor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda J. Cooper, Sylvia R. Caffey, Margaret J. Odems, Bernice B. Richardson, Dora A. Ward, Rosie Brady, Pearl Seldon, Betty Phillips, Alice Crumley and Sylvia Cunningham
Defendant: Meritor, Inc., Textron, Inc. and Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00052
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Grenada
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER denying 925 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/19/20. (jla)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 941 ORDER of Mediation and Suspension of Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/16/20. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV (ncb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER granting 929 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/28/20. (jla)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 922 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/12/19. (ncb)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER directing Textron to file affidavit in support of Motion to Enforce Settlement within 7 days. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/6/19. (jla)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 892 ORDER granting (890) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting (555) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting (559) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting (557) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; granting (128) Motion to Seal in case 4:18-cv-00023-DMB-JMV; granting (103) Motion to Seal in case 4:18-cv-00024-DMB-JMV; granting (98) Motion to Seal in case 4:18-cv-00025-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/3/19. (ncb)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 884 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/31/19. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 778 Motion to protect jury selection. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/28/19. (tab)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER Amending CMO. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/14/19. (ncb)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (757) Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part (759) Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part (761) Motion in Limine; granting (763) Motion in Limine; denying (765) Motion in Limine; denying (768) Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part (770) Motion in Limine; denying (772) Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part (774) Motion in Limine; denying (776) Motion in Limine; granting in part a nd denying in part (780) Motion in Limine in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (tab)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (540) Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part (544) Motion in Limine in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/11/19. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bds)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER denying (823) Motion to Disqualify Counsel in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; denying (503) Motion to Disqualify Counsel in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; denying (505) Motion to Disqualify Counsel in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; denying (505) Motion to Disqualify Counsel in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; denying (502) Motion to Disqualify Counsel in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/4/19. (ncb)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER denying Ore Tenus Motion for a Protective Order Regarding University of Oklahoma CSIA Lab Results. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/28/18. (bfg)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER granting 754 Motion to Substitute Party. Diane Seldon, as Administratrix of the Estate of Pearl Seldon, is hereby substituted as a plaintiff in the place of Pearl Seldon, deceased, in this action. The Clerk of this Court is directed to make the appropriate changes to the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/21/18. (ncb)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER that appealing defendants' objections are OVERRULED (530) Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision re (449 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-c v-00056-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 526 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 526 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 526 in 4:16-cv-00052-DM B-JMV, 526 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 526 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 449 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 451 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV) Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,,, in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; denying (453) Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision in c ase 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; denying (455) Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; denying (455) Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; denying (453) Motion to Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/31/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (tab)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER that Meritor's objections are OVERRULED re (445 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 447 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 522 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 445 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 447 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV) Objection,, filed by Meritor, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/25/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (tab)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER that Meritor's objections are overruled re 498 Objection,,,,,, filed by Meritor, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/15/18. (tab)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER denying 414 Motion to Sever; denying 528 Motion for Leave to Supplement. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/24/18. (tab)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER granting (496) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting (419) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting (421) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting (421) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-J MV; granting (419) Motion to Seal in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/17/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (tab)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (509) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (432) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (434) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (434) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (432) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/2/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER denying (501) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; denying (424) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; denying (426) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; denying (426) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00055-D MB-JMV; denying (424) Motion to Strike in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/27/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting (513) Motion to Stay in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting (436) Motion to Stay in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting (438) Motion to Stay in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting (438) Motion to Stay in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-J MV; granting (436) Motion to Stay in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/12/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting (485) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting (408) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting (410) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting (410) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-000 55-DMB-JMV; granting (408) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. The motion is GRANTED in so far as concerns production of the subject materials and taken under consideration as relates to an award of fees and expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/8/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER granting (487) Motion to stay application of February 7, 2018 Order in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting (410) Motion to stay application of February 7, 2018 Order in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting (412) Motion to stay applicatio n of February 7, 2018 Order in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting (412) Motion to stay application of February 7, 2018 Order in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; granting (410) Motion to stay application of February 7, 2018 Order in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/20/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting in part (and denying in part, as to a single document) (466) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (391) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in p art (393) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (393) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (391) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/7/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER re January 17, 2018 Status Conference (403 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 401 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 403 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 476 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 401 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/19/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (461) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (386) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (388) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (388) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; granting in part and denying in part (386) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/11/18. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting (439) Motion to Strike (338 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 405 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 342 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 340 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 340 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/28/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER Setting New CMO Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/8/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER denying (402) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV. If the trial court continues the trial date, the instant motion, as revised to reflect any appropriate changes given case developments, may be re-urged in accordance with any revised deadlines as the court may thereafter impose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/5/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER re (288 in 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 290 in 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV, 292 in 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 290 in 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 350 in 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV) Notice of Hearing re Privilege Log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/7/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting (353) Motion to Compel; denying (325) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; denying (264) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting (291) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; denying (266) Mo tion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting (293) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; denying (268) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting (295) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV; denying (266) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting (293) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/6/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (bfg)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER AMENDING CMO DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/25/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting (268) Motion to Quash in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; granting (209) Motion to Quash in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; granting (211) Motion to Quash in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; granting (213) Motion to Quash in case 4:16-cv-00055-D MB-JMV; granting (211) Motion to Quash in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/14/2017. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (ncb)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying (111) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV; denying (101) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV; denying (104) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV; denying (106) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00055-D MB-JMV; denying (104) Motion to Compel in case 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/12/17. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (tab)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/29/16. Associated Cases: 4:16-cv-00052-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00053-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00054-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00055-DMB-JMV, 4:16-cv-00056-DMB-JMV (jtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Meritor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda J. Cooper
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia R. Caffey
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret J. Odems
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice B. Richardson
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora A. Ward
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Brady
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Seldon
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Phillips
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Crumley
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Cunningham
Represented By: Steven H. Funderburg
Represented By: Alan D. Lancaster
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marvin Reid Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Represented By: Trudy D. Fisher
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?