Barnes v. Omega Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chaquita Barnes
Defendant: Omega Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00121
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINAL JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/30/17. (tab)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Notice of Hearing: Plaintiff shall submit her Final Pretrial Order by noon 10/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/24/17. (bfg)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/24/17. (jtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Omega Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaquita Barnes
Represented By: Walter Christian Morrison, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?