Crop Production Services, Inc. v. RTR Farms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Defendant: RTR Farms, Inc. and Richard J. Rick Young
Case Number: 4:2017cv00080
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Bolivar
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Closing Case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively CLOSE this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/15/20. (ncb)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER STAYING CASE until further order of the Court, pursuant to the automatic stay provided for under 11 U.S.C. § 362. The parties shall notify this Court within seven (7) days of any resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/17/17. (ncb)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Compel; granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time; conditionally granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting Joint Oral Motion to Extend CMO. Discovery due by 4/2/2018. Amendments/Joinder of Parties du e by 1/10/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2018. Plaintiff's Designation of Experts due by 2/1/2018. Defendants' Designation of Experts due by 3/1/2018. Motions due by 4/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/19/17. (ncb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crop Production Services, Inc. v. RTR Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: D. Andrew Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTR Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Keith Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Rick Young
Represented By: Bradford Keith Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?