McCray v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Otis Oliver McCray
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections, Paxton Paige, H. Williamson, Woods and Bernice Brown
Case Number: 4:2017cv00115
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Motions 26 , 57 , 60 , 63 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/17/18. (cr)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/16/18. (cr)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 48 Motion to withdraw magistrate judge consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/20/18. (cr)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 23 Motion for Advancement of Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/17. (jla)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Claim against Bernice Brown is DISMISSED with prejudice; claim against MCCF is dismissed; claim against MDOC, Dr. Paige, H.S.A.H. Williamson, and Dr. Woods will proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/9/17. (cr)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 7 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/8/17. (cr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Oliver McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxton Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?