Johnson v. Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Johnson
Defendant: Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00140
Filed: July 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/17/18. (tab)
October 16, 2018 NOTICE Cancelling re #11 Initial Order - Rule 16.1. No document attached (irw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal . (Turnage, Ellis)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John P. Hutchins is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendants. Counsel shall register with the Clerk as a user of the court's electronic filing system on or before October 15, 2018 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/10/18. (bfg)(no document attached)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney John P. Hutchins,(Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1596362) Certificate of Good Standing. (Dowd, Matthew)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 10/13/2018. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/04/18. (tab)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andrea L. Johnson. (Turnage, Ellis)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/21/2018. (irw)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim. (Wiech, Christopher)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.. (Wiech, Christopher)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher A. Wiech is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendants. Counsel shall register with the Clerk as a user of the courts electronic filing system on or before September 24, 2018 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/19/18. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Christopher A. Wiech,(Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1596369) by CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.. (Dowd, Matthew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney John P. Hutchins,(Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1596362) by CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.. (Dowd, Matthew)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellis Turnage on behalf of Andrea L. Johnson CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC served on 8/7/2018. (Turnage, Ellis)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC answer due 9/20/2018; CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 9/20/2018; Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. answer due 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/21/18. (ncb)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.. (Dowd, Matthew)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellis Turnage on behalf of Andrea L. Johnson CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 7/31/2018. (Turnage, Ellis)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
July 12, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
July 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number O537-1572878, filed by Andrea L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit 2 Recall - Firm Press Release, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unichem Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Mississippi Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Johnson
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?