Booker v. Meritor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Portia Booker
Defendant: Textron, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company and Meritor, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00153
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Grenada
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions due by 8/14/2019. See attached Addendum for amendments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/14/2018. (Attachment: # 1 Addendum) (irw)
September 10, 2018 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/10/2018. (irw)
September 5, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/10/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-390-4356. (irw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Textron's Initial Disclosures by William L. Smith on behalf of Textron, Inc. to All Parties of Record. (Smith, William)
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant The Boeing Company's Initial Disclosures by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of The Boeing Company to All Parties of Record. (Sykes, Phillip)
August 31, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. to All Parties of Record. (Sykes, Phillip)
August 31, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Meritor, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of Meritor, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)
August 31, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Barber Boone on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company (Boone, Harold)
August 31, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Requests for Production and Interrogatories by Marquette William Wolf on behalf of Portia Booker to All Defendants. (Wolf, Marquette) Modified on 9/4/2018 (jla).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 #18 #19 #20 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Neil Charles Abramson, Kelly Titus Scalise, Carol Welborn Reisman, and Nora Bolling Bilbro are hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Textron, Inc.. Counsel shall register with the Clerk as a user of the courts electronic filing system on or before September 5, 2018 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/31/18. (bfg)(no document attached)
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 Amended Answer and Defenses of Textron, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Textron, Inc.. (Smith, William)
August 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Fees Paid for Carol Welborn Reisman, Kelly Titus Scalise, Neil Charles Abramson and Nora Bolling Bilbro: $ 400.00, receipt number MSN300022568 (jtm)
August 28, 2018 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Textron, Inc.. (Scalise, Kelly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nora Bilbro ; Attorney Nora Bolling Bilbro, by Textron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Nora Bilbro) (Smith, William)
August 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Fees Paid by Timothy J. Coughlin, William J. Hubbard: $ 200.00, receipt number MSN300022565 (jtm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pro Hac Vice Application of Carol Reisman ; Attorney Carol Welborn Reisman, by Textron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LA Certificate of Good Standing - Carol Resiman, #2 Exhibit TX Certificate of Good Standing - Carol Reisman) (Smith, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pro Hac Vice Application of Kelly Scalise ; Attorney Kelly Titus Scalise, by Textron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Kelly Scalise) (Smith, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pro HAc Vice Application of Neil Abramson ; Attorney Neil Charles Abramson, by Textron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Neil Abramson) (Smith, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William J. Hubbard on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company (Hubbard, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J. Coughlin on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company (Coughlin, Timothy)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Timothy J. Coughlin and William J. Hubbard are hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of the the Defendants. Counsel shall register with the Clerk as a user of the courts electronic filing system on or before August 29, 2018 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/24/18. (bfg)(no document attached)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lea Ann Smith on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company (Smith, Lea)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney William J. Hubbard, by Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sykes, Phillip)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Timothy J. Coughlin, by Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sykes, Phillip)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Marquette William Wolf on behalf of Portia Booker to All Defendants. (Wolf, Marquette)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Boeing Company. (Sykes, Phillip)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Meritor, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 Textron, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Textron, Inc.. (Smith, William)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/25/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2018. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/25/2018. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/27/2018. Motions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/10/2018. (irw)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Master Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs and Master Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Textron, Inc., The Boeing Company to All Counsel of Record. (Sykes, Phillip)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Liston, III on behalf of Portia Booker Meritor, Inc. served on 7/30/2018; Rockwell Automation, Inc. served on 7/30/2018; Textron, Inc. served on 7/30/2018; The Boeing Company served on 7/30/2018. (Liston, William)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Reissued as to Textron, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
July 25, 2018 Case Reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)
July 18, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Textron, Inc., The Boeing Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1575239, filed by Portia Booker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker v. Meritor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Represented By: Nora Bolling Bilbro
Represented By: Neil Charles Abramson
Represented By: Carol Welborn Reisman
Represented By: Kelly Titus Scalise
Represented By: William L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Timothy J. Coughlin
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Represented By: William J. Hubbard
Represented By: Harold Barber Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Timothy J. Coughlin
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Represented By: William J. Hubbard
Represented By: Harold Barber Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Timothy J. Coughlin
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Represented By: William J. Hubbard
Represented By: Harold Barber Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Booker
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: William Liston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?