Word v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Word
Defendant: Personal Care Products Council, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00188
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Remark; transferred case has been opened in USDC Northern District of New Jersey as Case No. 3:18cv14353 (jla)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Case Transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (tab)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE Cancelling Telephonic Case Management Conference re #4 Initial Order - Rule 16.1. Case stayed. (irw)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed for the earlier of 60 days or transfer by the JPML to the MDL court. No further written order on the motion will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/18/18. (ncb)(no document attached)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Patrick Joseph Downey) (Rippee, Stephanie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Circuit Clerk, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Letter of Assignment, #5 Summons to Imerys Talc America, #6 Summons to Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., #7 Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #8 Summons to Personal Care Products Council, #9 Proof of Service on Imerys Talc America, #10 Proof of Service on Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., #11 Proof of Service on Johnson & Johnson, #12 Proof of Service on Personal Care Products Council, #13 Notice of Dismissal, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mitchell, Meade)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order Staying Case, #2 Exhibit B Transfer Order) (Mitchell, Meade)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Mitchell, Meade)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/12/2018. (irw)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Mitchell, Meade)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Personal Care Products Council, filed by Crystal Word. (jtm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. from Circuit Court of Coahoma County, Mississippi, case number 14-CI-18-0024. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1594222) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Joinder in and Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit of Kasey Mitchell Adams, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Word v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Word
Represented By: Graham P. Carner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Care Products Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Meade Westmoreland Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Meade Westmoreland Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie McGee Rippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?