Miller et al v. City of Leland et al

Plaintiff: Clara Jones, Pearlie Smith, Miranda Carter, Rose Brooks, Wendell Thomas, Jerdo Newsome, Jimmy Whitley, Cornelius Davis, Emma Riggins, Chardonnay Williams, Irvisha Adams, Richard Warren, Joe Frazier, Robert Smith, Mary Anderson, Delois Taylor, Rosetta Johnson, Iman McClure, Cheryl Johnson, Veronica Miller, Lorenzie Smith, Kimberly Robinson, Marcus Flowers, Matalean Jones, Tiffany Hite, Jeffery Butler, Denita Wilson, Linda Robinson, Andrew Goodson, Harold Norals, Kathleen Smith, Linda Smith, Selmond Norals, Queosha Williams, Twandolyn Sims, Vivian Gaither, Ruthie Jones, Florida Pittman, Willie Mae Richmond, Lywanda Welton, Jessie Rainey, Eartha Simmons, Deloris McWright and Dominique Cox
Defendant: Defendants A-D, City of Leland, Mayor Kenny Thomas, Alderwoman Lisa Bush and Leland Light and Water Department
Case Number: 4:2018cv00254
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to Complaint First Amended [Doc. 6, Pages 4-10] by Lisa Bush, City of Leland, Leland Light and Water Department, Kenny Thomas. (Griffith, Daniel)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion to Amend/Correct. An amended document #6 has been filed. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/28/19. (ncb)(no document attached)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court,,, by Irvisha Adams, Mary Anderson, Rose Brooks, Jeffery Butler, Miranda Carter, Dominique Cox, Cornelius Davis, Marcus Flowers, Joe Frazier, Vivian Gaither, Andrew Goodson, Tiffany Hite, Cheryl Johnson, Rosetta Johnson, Clara Jones, Matalean Jones, Ruthie Jones, Iman McClure, Deloris McWright, Veronica Miller, Jerdo Newsome, Harold Norals, Selmond Norals, Florida Pittman, Jessie Rainey, Willie Mae Richmond, Emma Riggins, Kimberly Robinson, Linda Robinson, Eartha Simmons, Twandolyn Sims, Kathleen Smith, Linda Smith, Lorenzie Smith, Pearlie Smith, Robert Smith, Delois Taylor, Wendell Thomas, Richard Warren, Lywanda Welton, Jimmy Whitley, Chardonnay Williams, Queosha Williams, Denita Wilson. (Harris, Ashley)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/16/19. (irw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court,,, by Irvisha Adams, Mary Anderson, Rose Brooks, Jeffery Butler, Miranda Carter, Dominique Cox, Cornelius Davis, Marcus Flowers, Joe Frazier, Vivian Gaither, Andrew Goodson, Tiffany Hite, Cheryl Johnson, Rosetta Johnson, Clara Jones, Matalean Jones, Ruthie Jones, Iman McClure, Deloris McWright, Veronica Miller, Jerdo Newsome, Harold Norals, Selmond Norals, Florida Pittman, Jessie Rainey, Willie Mae Richmond, Emma Riggins, Kimberly Robinson, Linda Robinson, Eartha Simmons, Twandolyn Sims, Kathleen Smith, Linda Smith, Lorenzie Smith, Pearlie Smith, Robert Smith, Delois Taylor, Wendell Thomas, Richard Warren, Lywanda Welton, Jimmy Whitley, Chardonnay Williams, Queosha Williams, Denita Wilson. (Harris, Ashley)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B Docket Page, #3 Exhibit C Fee Bill, #4 Exhibit D Complaint, #5 Exhibit E Summons to Mayor, #6 Exhibit F Summons to Bush, #7 Exhibit G Summons to City Clerk, #8 Exhibit H Letter, #9 Exhibit I Plaintiff's Request for Default Entry, #10 Exhibit J EOA DG, #11 Exhibit K EOA MMG, #12 Exhibit L Motion to Dismiss, #13 Exhibit M Clerk Default Motion, #14 Exhibit N Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #15 Exhibit O Letter Fax, #16 Exhibit P Order, #17 Exhibit Q Notice of Hearing, #18 Exhibit R Email, #19 Exhibit S Letter, #20 Exhibit T Plaintiff's Motion for Time to Respond to MTD, #21 Exhibit U Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #22 Exhibit V Letter, #23 Exhibit W Entry of Appearance DG, #24 Exhibit X Entry of Appearance MMG, #25 Exhibit Notice of Removal) (Griffith, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wendell Thomas, Pearlie Smith, Denita Wilson, Lywanda Welton, Clara Jones, Robert Smith, Jeffery Butler, Veronica Miller, Emma Riggins, Chardonnay Williams, Selmond Norals, Richard Warren, Miranda Carter, Marcus Flowers, Florida Pittman, Jimmy Whitley, Willie Mae Richmond, Dominique Cox, Kimberly Robinson, Iman McClure, Rose Brooks, Queosha Williams, Rosetta Johnson, Linda Robinson, Jessie Rainey, Ruthie Jones, Harold Norals, Cornelius Davis, Vivian Gaither, Tiffany Hite, Mary Anderson, Kathleen Smith, Lorenzie Smith, Twandolyn Sims, Irvisha Adams, Delois Taylor, Jerdo Newsome, Cheryl Johnson, Matalean Jones, Deloris McWright, Eartha Simmons, Andrew Goodson, Joe Frazier, Linda Smith. (jwr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lisa Bush, City of Leland, Leland Light and Water Department, Kenny Thomas from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 2018-0101CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1625733) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Lisa Bush, City of Leland, Leland Light and Water Department, Kenny Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment 1 to Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. City of Leland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Jones
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearlie Smith
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Carter
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Brooks
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Thomas
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerdo Newsome
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Whitley
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Davis
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Riggins
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chardonnay Williams
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvisha Adams
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Warren
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Frazier
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anderson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delois Taylor
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Johnson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iman McClure
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Johnson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Miller
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzie Smith
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Robinson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Flowers
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matalean Jones
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hite
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Butler
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denita Wilson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Robinson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Goodson
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Norals
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Smith
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Smith
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selmond Norals
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queosha Williams
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twandolyn Sims
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Gaither
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthie Jones
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Pittman
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Richmond
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lywanda Welton
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Rainey
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eartha Simmons
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris McWright
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Cox
Represented By: Ashley N. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A-D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Leland
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Kenny Thomas
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alderwoman Lisa Bush
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Light and Water Department
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?