Grant v. Washington County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Grant
Defendant: John Does 1-15, Washington County Regional Correctional Facility and Washington County, Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2019cv00005
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Supplemental Core Disclosures by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Washington County, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary)
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nathaniel Grant by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Washington County, Mississippi (Griffith, Mary)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/21/2019. (irw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 8/26/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 5/14/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 6/14/2019. Motions due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/14/2019. (irw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2019. (irw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents,and Requests for Admissions by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Washington County, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jla). Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Federal Claims filed by Washington County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to State Law Claims filed by Washington County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Nathaniel Grant to Defendants. (Moore, Carlos)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to State Law Claims filed by Nathaniel Grant. (Moore, Carlos)
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to State Law Claims filed by Nathaniel Grant. (Moore, Carlos) Modified on 2/6/2019 to modify docket text to reflect document title (jwr).
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Federal Claims, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Nathaniel Grant. (Moore, Carlos)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Federal Claims filed by Nathaniel Grant. (Moore, Carlos)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to State Law Claims filed by Nathaniel Grant. (Moore, Carlos)
February 6, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion: Attorney to refile with correct document. (jwr)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Core Disclosures by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Washington County, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Federal Claims . (Griffith, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Federal Claims by Washington County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to State Law Claims . (Griffith, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to State Law Claims by Washington County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Mayo Portner on behalf of Washington County, Mississippi (Portner, Katherine) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Nathaniel Grant (Moore, Carlos)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/16/19. (irw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Washington County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Docket Page, #2 Exhibit B Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C Complaint, #4 Exhibit D Summons, #5 Exhibit E Summons, #6 Exhibit F Fee Bill, #7 Exhibit G EOA DG, #8 Exhibit H EOA MMG, #9 Exhibit I Notice of Removal) (Griffith, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does 1-15, Washington County, Mississippi, filed by Nathaniel Grant. (tab) Modified on 2/20/2019 (jla).
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Washington County, Mississippi from Circuit Court of Washington County, Mississippi, case number 2019-0003CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1632642) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Washington County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Washington County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Regional Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Represented By: Katherine Mayo Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Grant
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?