Pugh v. Thigpen et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Pugh
Defendant: Mrs. Sturdevant, Lee Simon, Edward Thigpen and Tony Foster
Case Number: 4:2019cv00013
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Spears Hearing set for 7/16/2018 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/18/19. (cr)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/18/19. (cr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. For chambers contact information please see the following web site. ** www.msnd.uscourts.gov/judges-information ** (cr) (cr).
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND CERTIFICATION TO CONTINUE LAWSUIT. (cr)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 2/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/19. (cr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Pugh. (cr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement filed by Brandon Pugh. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pugh v. Thigpen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?