CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC v. Auerswald
Plaintiff: CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC
Defendant: Charles Cameron Auerswald
Case Number: 4:2019cv00017
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/18/19. (irw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC by Charles Cameron Auerswald. (Auerswald, Charles)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Debra M. Brown: Replevin Hearing held on 3/14/2019. (Court Reporter Brenda Blackburn.) (rt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Jarrett Little on behalf of CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC Charles Cameron Auerswald served on 2/18/2019. (Little, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Replevin Hearing set for 3/13/2019 09:00 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles Cameron Auerswald. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Entry of Fiat. Clerk of court is directed to issue summons in accordance with the Fiat.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/14/19. (jtm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Entry of Fiat by CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC. (Little, William)
January 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1638304, filed by CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Lease, #2 Exhibit B-UCC-1 Financing Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC v. Auerswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC
Represented By: William Jarrett Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cameron Auerswald
Represented By: Charles Cameron Auerswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?