Johnson v. Indianola, Mississippi Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Kennith Johnson
Defendant: Indianola, Mississippi Police Department, Indianola Board of Alderman, Indianola, Mississippi Police Officer Darnell Fisher, Indianola Board of Aldermen, City of Indianola, Mississippi and Darnell Fisher
Case Number: 4:2019cv00019
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion TO DISMISS FISHER IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY filed by Kennith Johnson. (Morris, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss DARNELL FISHER in his OFFICIAL CAPACITY filed by Kennith Johnson. (Morris, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for August 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/28/19. (rtc)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 6/28/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 7/29/2019. Motions due by 10/21/2019. Settlement Conference set for 8/14/2019 01:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/28/19. (rtc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 3/28/2019. (rtc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Francis Starr Springer on behalf of Darnell Fisher to Plaintiff. (Springer, Francis)
March 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Disclosures by Daniel Ellis Morris on behalf of Kennith Johnson to Defendants. (Morris, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Darnell Fisher. (Springer, Francis)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Core Disclosures by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of City of Indianola, Mississippi, Darnell Fisher to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Indianola, Mississippi, Darnell Fisher. (Griffith, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Indianola, Mississippi, Darnell Fisher. (Griffith, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. See #3 Rule 16.1 Initial Order for instructions. (rtc)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/6/19. (cs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by City of Indianola, Mississippi, Darnell Fisher. (Griffith, Mary)
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Indianola, Mississippi,, filed by Kennith Johnson. (Morris, Daniel)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; terminating #12 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/11/19. (cs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 First MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kennith Johnson. (Morris, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims filed by Kennith Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Marked Exhibits A, B, C, #2 Exhibit of Exhibit B) (Morris, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to File by Kennith Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Morris, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 3/19/19 re #9 Order on Motion to Stay (rtc)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay due to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/1/19. (cs)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Stay . (Griffith, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Indianola Board of Alderman, Indianola, Mississippi Police Department, Indianola, Mississippi Police Officer Darnell Fisher. (Griffith, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims . (Griffith, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims by Indianola Board of Alderman, Indianola, Mississippi Police Department, Indianola, Mississippi Police Officer Darnell Fisher. (Griffith, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Docket Page, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Fee Bill Sheet, #4 Exhibit D Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F Summons to Mayor, #7 Exhibit G Summons to Fisher, #8 Exhibit H Summons to Chief, #9 Errata I Summons to Board of Aldermen, #10 Exhibit J EOA DG, #11 Exhibit K Motion to Dismiss, #12 Exhibit L EOA MMG, #13 Exhibit M Summons Return on Mayor, #14 Exhibit N Summons Return on Fisher, #15 Exhibit O Summons Return on Chief, #16 Exhibit P Summons Return on Board of Aldermen, #17 Exhibit Q Re-Notice of Hearing, #18 Exhibit R Certificate of Clerk, #19 Exhibit S Notice of Removal) (Griffith, Daniel)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/29/19. (rtc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kennith Johnson. (jwr)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Indianola, Mississippi Police Department, Indianola Board of Alderman, Indianola, Mississippi Police Officer Darnell Fisher from Circuit Court of Sunflower County, case number 2018-0111. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1639199) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Indianola, Mississippi Police Department, Indianola Board of Alderman, Indianola, Mississippi Police Officer Darnell Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D-Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E-Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss) (jwr)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Indianola, Mississippi Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianola, Mississippi Police Department
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianola Board of Alderman
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianola, Mississippi Police Officer Darnell Fisher
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianola Board of Aldermen
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Indianola, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Fisher
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Represented By: Francis Starr Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennith Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Ellis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?