Dunigan v. Mississippi Valley State University et al

Plaintiff: Chinna Dunigan
Defendant: Mississippi Valley State University and Renardo Hall
Case Number: 4:2019cv00033
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mississippi Valley State University. (jwr)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant MVSU by Chinna Dunigan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1: Attorney declaration, #2 Summons 2: Executed summons) (Dillard, Joel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Frank Dillard on behalf of Chinna Dunigan Mississippi Valley State University served on 3/18/2019. (Dillard, Joel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Mississippi Valley State University and Renardo Hall (jla)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Renardo Hall, Mississippi Valley State University. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1649371, filed by Chinna Dunigan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunigan v. Mississippi Valley State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Valley State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renardo Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinna Dunigan
Represented By: Joel Frank Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?