Martin v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Robert P. Martin
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv00038
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/30/2019. (ray)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Iwana Rademaekers is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by April 23, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 04/18/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
April 17, 2019 NOTICE of Conference: #5 Case Management Conference RESET for 5/16/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Iwana Rademaekers,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1667857) by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Harris, Adam)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Liberty Life Assurance Company. (Harris, Adam)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 04/15/19. (irw)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Harris, Adam)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Complaint by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Robert P. Martin to Life Liberty Assurance Company of Boston. (Reynolds, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1657282, filed by Robert P. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Adam B. Harris
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Martin
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Represented By: Leanna Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?