Price et al v. City of Shelby, Mississippi et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Brewer, Clarence Price and Arseedrick Smith
Defendant: City of Shelby, Mississippi, Chief Kenneth Hampton and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2019cv00075
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/24/19. (jtm)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants are hereby granted an extension of forty (40) days within which to respond to the complaint. City of Shelby, Mississippi answer due 7/16/2019; Kenneth Hampton answer due 7/16/2019. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/23/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Terrill Pulliam on behalf of City of Shelby, Mississippi, Kenneth Hampton (Pulliam, Jessica)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by City of Shelby, Mississippi, Kenneth Hampton. (Butler, Gregory)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Todd Jeffreys on behalf of Clarence Price, Jeffery Brewer, Arseedrick Smith Kenneth Hampton served on 5/16/2019. (Jeffreys, Steven)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Todd Jeffreys on behalf of Clarence Price, Jeffery Brewer, Arseedrick Smith City of Shelby, Mississippi served on 5/16/2019. (Jeffreys, Steven)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Carr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carr, Michael)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Shelby, Mississippi, Kenneth Hampton. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1677916, filed by Clarence Price, Jeffery Brewer, Arseedrick Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. City of Shelby, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Brewer
Represented By: Steven Todd Jeffreys
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Price
Represented By: Steven Todd Jeffreys
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arseedrick Smith
Represented By: Steven Todd Jeffreys
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shelby, Mississippi
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Jessica Terrill Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Kenneth Hampton
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Jessica Terrill Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?