Brown v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Brenda Joyce Brown
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00077
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy Berryhill served on 5/22/2019. (jwr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to USM for service. (jwr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue process for the defendant named in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/17/19. (ncb)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Joyce Brown. (jwr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Brenda Joyce Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Joyce Brown
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?