The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00079
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/5/19. (rtc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Jury Trial by The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church. (May, William)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for September 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/19. (rtc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/3/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/3/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/4/2019. Motions due by 1/23/2020. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/19. (rtc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 7/2/2019. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to State Court Complaint (see State Court Record, Exhibit 29) by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (jla)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Core Disclosures by William T. May on behalf of The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church to Defendant. (May, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Michael C. Gatling on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company to Plaintiff. (Gatling, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fax copy of CCTB email requesting court record, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Fee Bill, #5 Exhibit Circuit Clerk Invoice, #6 Exhibit Issued Summons, #7 Exhibit Served Summons, #8 Exhibit MID letter to State Auto (1), #9 Exhibit CCTB fax re record, #10 Exhibit MID letter to State Auto (2), #11 Exhibit CCTB fax re record, #12 Exhibit First removal certification, #13 Exhibit CCTB invoice, #14 Exhibit CCTB letter re removal, #15 Exhibit First Notice of removal to State Court, #16 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Exhibit Complaint, #19 Exhibit Invoice, #20 Exhibit Invoice, #21 Exhibit Invoice payment, #22 Exhibit Invoice, #23 Exhibit N.D. Miss. letter re remand, #24 Exhibit Remand Order, #25 Exhibit Pacer Docket, #26 Exhibit CCTB letter re Motion to Substitute, #27 Exhibit State Auto's Motion to Substitute, #28 Exhibit Complaint, #29 Exhibit Answer, #30 Exhibit Certified Policy, #31 Exhibit CCTB letter re Notice of Service, #32 Exhibit State Auto's Notice of Service, #33 Exhibit Court order re response to Motion, #34 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Substitute, #35 Exhibit Land Record Exhibit, #36 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Requests for Admission, #37 Exhibit CCTB letter re rebuttal to motion to substitute, #38 Exhibit Rebuttal to motion to substitute, #39 Exhibit Plaintiff's answers to Requests for Admission, #40 Exhibit Complaint, #41 Exhibit Order on Motion to Substitute) (Gatling, Michael)
June 18, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 (jla)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Gatling, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/28/19. (rtc)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church. (tab)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Grenada County, Mississippi, case number 2018-177-CVL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1681686) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order, #2 Exhibit B State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Declarations, #4 Exhibit D E-mail, #5 Exhibit E Answers to Request for Admissions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence Dillon King
Represented By: Michael C. Gatling
Represented By: Dale Gibson Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trustees of Belleflower M B Church
Represented By: William T. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?