Meredith v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Madelene G. Meredith
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00081
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Social Security Hearing set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Greenville Courtroom 2 and the U.S. Attorney's office in Oxford, MS before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Concerning Consent to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/22/19. (irw)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/22/19. (Attachment: #1 Consent) (irw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Transcript by Nancy Berryhill. (Benedict, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nancy Berryhill. (Benedict, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy Berryhill served on 6/3/2019. (tab)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (edc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue process for the defendant named in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/24/19. (ncb)
May 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Madelene G. Meredith. (jwr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Madelene G. Meredith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelene G. Meredith
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?