Humphreys County, Mississippi v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Humphreys County, Mississippi
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00083
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 CORRECTED NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 7/27/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt) (Corrected Main Document 11 replaced on 7/26/2019) (rt).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for November 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/19/19. (rtc)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/20/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/21/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/21/2019. Motions due by 2/11/2020. Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/19/19. (rtc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 7/19/2019. (rtc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Jeffrey S. Dilley on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company to All Counsel. (Dilley, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Notification of Removal) (Dilley, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/5/19. (rtc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Dilley, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Dilley, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company, filed by Humphreys County, Mississippi. (jla)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company from Humphreys County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0014. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1684000) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphreys County, Mississippi v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humphreys County, Mississippi
Represented By: Willie Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?