Goss et al v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Glenn Goss and Molly Goss
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00085
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 NOTICE of Conference: #9 Case Management Conference RESET for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/12/19. (irw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts . (Stephenson, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has an additional 7 days from the current due date to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/3/19. (JMV)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint that is Unopposed by Counsel by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. (Stovall, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael C. Steele on behalf of Glenn Goss, Molly Goss Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company served on 6/13/2019. (Steele, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip W. Gaines on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gaines, Philip)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1684086, filed by Glenn Goss, Molly Goss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goss et al v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Goss
Represented By: Michael C. Steele
Represented By: Philip W. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Goss
Represented By: Michael C. Steele
Represented By: Philip W. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Represented By: David E. Stovall
Represented By: Robert R. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?