Allstate Insurance Company v. Boyette et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert Boyette, John Does 1 - 25, Bobby Squires, The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Jimmy Squires, The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Dorothy J. Mills, Sandra Squires and James Mills
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00104
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $100,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/3/19. (bnd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hicks, Jenessa)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Clark Trout on behalf of James Mills, Bobby Squires, Sandra Squires, The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Dorothy J. Mills, The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Jimmy Squires (Trout, Edgar)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Dorothy J. Mills served on 7/27/2019; James Mills served on 7/27/2019. (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company Robert Boyette served on 7/27/2019. (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 10/8/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States of America(on behalf of the United States Department of Defense (Tricare)) answer due 9/11/2019; United States of America(on behalf of the United States Department of Health and Human Services (Medicare)) answer due 9/11/2019.; granting #10 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/30/19. (cs)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Accompanying Deadlines by United States of America(on behalf of the United States Department of Defense (Tricare)), United States of America(on behalf of the United States Department of Health and Human Services (Medicare)). (Davis, Stuart)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by United States of America(on behalf of the United States Department of Defense (Tricare)), United States of America(on behalf of the United States Department of Health and Human Services (Medicare)). (Davis, Stuart)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/26/19. (rtc)
July 24, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (tab)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert Boyette, The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Dorothy J. Mills through James Mills. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company Air EVAC EMS, Inc. served on 6/19/2019. (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company University of Mississippi Medical Center served on 6/19/2019. (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company Sandra Squires served on 7/3/2019. (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (state court), #2 Complaint for Interpleader, #3 Summons (AARP), #4 Summons (UMMC), #5 Summons (TRICARE), #6 Summons (Steve Squires), #7 Summons (Robert Boyette), #8 Summons (CMS), #9 Summons (CHI St. Vincent's North), #10 Summons (Bobby Squires), #11 Summons (James Mills), #12 Order Setting Hearing, #13 First Amended Complaint for Interpleader, #14 Summons Returned Executed (CHI St. Vincent's North), #15 Summons Returned Executed (Bobby Squires), #16 Summons (UMMC by and through the Attorney General of Mississippi), #17 Summons (Air EVAC EMS, Inc.), #18 Summons Returned Executed (UMMC by and through the Attorney General of Mississippi), #19 Summons Returned Executed (Air EVAC EMS, Inc.), #20 Summons Returned Executed (Steve Squires), #21 Summons by Publication (the wrongful death beneficiaries and/or estate of Jimmy Squires; John Does 1-25; the wrongful death beneficiaries and/or estate of Dorthy J. Mills), #22 Summons (Sandra Squires), #23 Second Amended Complaint for Interpleader, #24 Summons Response (Air EVAC EMS, Inc.), #25 Notice of Removal (state court), #26 Notice of Removal (federal court)) (Davis, Stuart)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (jwr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America on behalf of the United States Department of Defense (Tricare) and on behalf of the United States Department of Health and Human Services (Medicare) from Chancery Court of Washington County, Mississippi, case number 2019-0162. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by United States of America on behalf of the United States Department of Defense (Tricare) and on behalf of the United States Department of Health and Human Services (Medicare). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Summons, #3 Exhibit C: Order Setting Hearing, #4 Exhibit D: First Amended Complaint for Interpleader, #5 Exhibit E: Second Amended Complaint for Interpleader, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Boyette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Boyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Squires
Represented By: Edgar Clark Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Jimmy Squires
Represented By: Edgar Clark Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wrongful Death Beneficiaries and/or Estate of Dorothy J. Mills
Represented By: Edgar Clark Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Squires
Represented By: Edgar Clark Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mills
Represented By: Edgar Clark Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jenessa Carter Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?