Kizart v. James et al
Plaintiff: Kendall Kizart
Defendant: Fastenal Company and Juan James, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00118
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/30/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/9/19. Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-00110-SA-JMV, 4:19-cv-00118-DMB-JMV (irw)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting (9) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:19-cv-00110-SA-JMV. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/4/19. Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-00110-SA-JMV, 4:19-cv-00118-DMB-JMV (tab)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/1/19. (tab)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 9/30/2019. (irw)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Robert E. Briggs, III on behalf of Fastenal Company, Juan James, Jr to Plaintiff. (Briggs, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Steven Todd Jeffreys on behalf of Kendall Kizart to Attorney for Defendants. (Jeffreys, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Kendall Kizart. (Jeffreys, Steven)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/30/19. (irw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fastenal Company, Juan James, Jr. (Briggs, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Todd Jeffreys on behalf of Kendall Kizart Fastenal Company served on 8/19/2019. (Jeffreys, Steven)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fastenal Company, Juan James, Jr.; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1709113, filed by Kendall Kizart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kizart v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastenal Company
Represented By: Robert E. Briggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan James, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Briggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Kizart
Represented By: Steven Todd Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?