Bell v. SW Gaming, LLC
Plaintiff: Ludella Bell
Defendant: Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa and SW Gaming, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00141
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Stephanie N. Morris on behalf of Ludella Bell to DEFENDANT. (Morris, Stephanie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SW Gaming LLC's Rule 26(a) Initial Prediscovery Disclosures by Ian Russell Underwood on behalf of SW Gaming, LLC to Plaintiff Ludella Bell. (Underwood, Ian)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/31/19. (irw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/27/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/27/2020. Motions due by 5/11/2020. Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/29/19. (irw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/29/2019. (irw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Morris on behalf of Ludella Bell (Morris, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re Notice of Correction; disregard notice- entered in error (jla)
October 22, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Please file State Court Record pursuant to the red text in the Notice of Removal docket entry (jla)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/16/19. (bfg)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/16/19. (bfg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order Unopposed by Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa. (Underwood, Ian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party Unopposed by Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa. (Underwood, Ian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF SW GAMING LLC. (Underwood, Ian)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Blake Damon Smith on behalf of Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa to Plaintiff Ludella Bell. (Smith, Blake)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Blake Damon Smith on behalf of Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa to Plaintiff Ludella Bell. (Smith, Blake)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 09/25/2019. (jwr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/25/19. (irw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SW Gaming's ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa. (Underwood, Ian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dale Gibson Russell on behalf of Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa (Russell, Dale)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Damon Smith on behalf of Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa (Smith, Blake)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Receipt) (Underwood, Ian)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa, filed by Ludella Bell. (jwr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa from Circuit Court of Washington County, Mississippi, case number 2019-0088. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number MSN300024761) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. SW Gaming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludella Bell
Represented By: Stephanie N. Morris
Represented By: Thomas Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlow's Casino Resorts & Spa
Represented By: Ian Russell Underwood
Represented By: Blake Damon Smith
Represented By: Dale Gibson Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW Gaming, LLC
Represented By: Ian Russell Underwood
Represented By: Blake Damon Smith
Represented By: Dale Gibson Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?