Buck et al v. Medical Transport Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kimble, Charvetta Buck and Natisha Buck
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Elite Medical Services, Inc., Jim Dintelman, Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC and XYZ Corporations 1-3
Case Number: 4:2019cv00142
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw) (Main Document 18 replaced on 11/15/2019) (irw).
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2019. (irw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Assert Counter-Claim . (Burrow, Nathan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Assert Counter-Claim by Elite Medical Services, Inc., John Does 1-5, Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Amended Answer and Counter-Claim) (Burrow, Nathan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Discovery Disclosures by Kathryn Breard Platt on behalf of Jim Dintelman, Elite Medical Services, Inc., Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC to Plaintiffs' counsel. (Platt, Kathryn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Ja'Nekia W. M. Barton on behalf of Charvetta Buck, Charvetta Buck, Natisha Buck, Jennifer Kimble to Attorney of Record. (Barton, Ja'Nekia)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/11/19. (irw)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SEALING FILINGS AND REQUIRING REFILING IN REDACTED FORM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/2/19. (ncb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Jim Dintelman, #4 Summons to Elite Medical Services, #5 Summons to Medical Trans Mgt, LLC, #6 Summons to Medical Trans Mgt, Inc., #7 State Court Complaint Complaint, #8 Receipt Fee Bill Receipt, #9 Cover Letter, #10 Summons Returns as to Dintelman and Elite Med Svs, #11 Summons Returns as to MTM LLC and MTM Inc, #12 Notice of Removal to State Ct) (Platt, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 . (jla)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions by Kathryn Breard Platt on behalf of Jim Dintelman, Elite Medical Services, Inc., Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC to Plaintiffs' counsel. (Platt, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Redacted Notice of Service) (jtm).
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF MEDICAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Platt, Kathryn) Modified on 9/27/2019 (jla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Redacted Corporate Statement) (jtm).
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF MEDICAL TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Platt, Kathryn) Modified on 9/27/2019 (jla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Redacted Corporate Statement) (jtm).
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF ELITE MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. (Platt, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Redacted Corporate Statement) (jtm).
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 DEFENSES AND ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Jim Dintelman, Elite Medical Services, Inc., Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC. (Platt, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Redacted Answer to State Court Complaint) (jtm).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Platt, Kathryn)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan L. Burrow on behalf of Jim Dintelman, Elite Medical Services, Inc., Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC (Burrow, Nathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Redacted Notice of Attorney Appearance) (jtm).
September 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Jim Dintelman, Elite Medical Services, Inc., John Does 1-5, Medical Transport Management, Inc., Medical Transport Management, LLC, XYZ Corporations 1-3, filed by Charvetta Buck(on behalf of Kailyn Buck), Jennifer Kimble, Charvetta Buck, Natisha Buck. (jtm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Elite Medical Services, Inc., Jim Dintelman, Medical Transport Management, LLC, Medical Transport Management, Inc. from Circuit Court of Washington County, Mississippi, case number 2019-0075 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number MSN300024767) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Elite Medical Services, Inc., Jim Dintelman, Medical Transport Management, LLC, Medical Transport Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #8 Redacted Notice of Removal) (jtm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck et al v. Medical Transport Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Breard Platt
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dintelman
Represented By: Kathryn Breard Platt
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Transport Management, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Breard Platt
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Transport Management, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Breard Platt
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kimble
Represented By: Ja'Nekia W. M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charvetta Buck
Represented By: Ja'Nekia W. M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natisha Buck
Represented By: Ja'Nekia W. M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?