Reed v. Saul
Plaintiff: Daphane Reed
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00151
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Transcript by Andrew Saul. (Benedict, Joseph)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrew Saul. (Benedict, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Saul served on 10/7/2019. (tab)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to USM for service. (jtm)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue process for the defendant named in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/7/19. (ncb)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daphane Reed. (jwr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Daphane Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphane Reed
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Joseph Luke Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?