Galloway v. Saul
Plaintiff: William Lloyd Galloway
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00170
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of William Lloyd Galloway William Barr served on 12/2/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)
November 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of William Lloyd Galloway Social Security Administration Commissioner c/o General Counsel served on 11/27/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)
November 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of William Lloyd Galloway William Lamar served on 11/25/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300025122, filed by William Lloyd Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lloyd Galloway
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?