Benford v. Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Benford
Defendant: William Jason Homes, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Timothy Jenkins and Dale Russell
Case Number: 4:2019cv00179
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss All Claims . (Ellison, Kurt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss All Claims by William Jason Homes, Timothy Jenkins, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Dale Russell. (Ellison, Kurt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Farrah Noelle Winter Rifelj on behalf of All Defendants (Rifelj, Farrah)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt F. Ellison on behalf of All Defendants (Ellison, Kurt)
January 28, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Decisions cited in Memorandum) (Brock, Henry)
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims by William Jason Homes, Timothy Jenkins, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Dale Russell. (Brock, Henry)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kurt F. Ellison. If counsel has not already completed the registration process for electronic filing, counsel shall do so within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/28/20. (bfg) (jtm).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Farrah N.W. Rifelj. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/28/20. (bfg) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/28/2020) (irw).
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kurt F. Ellison,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1765559) Certificate of Good Standing. (Brock, Henry)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Farrah N.W. Rifelj,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1765553) Certificate of Good Standing. (Brock, Henry)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kurt F. Ellison,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1765559) by William Jason Homes, Timothy Jenkins, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Dale Russell. (Brock, Henry)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Farrah N.W. Rifelj,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1765553) by William Jason Homes, Timothy Jenkins, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Dale Russell. (Brock, Henry)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers due 1/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/21/20. (bfg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Jacqueline Benford William Jason Homes served on 1/7/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Jacqueline Benford Dale Russell served on 1/7/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Jacqueline Benford Timothy Jenkins served on 1/7/2020. (Moore, Carlos)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email, #2 Exhibit email, #3 Exhibit email) (Brock, Henry)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by William Jason Homes, Timothy Jenkins, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Dale Russell. (Brock, Henry)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Donald Brock, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Brock, Henry)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Jacqueline Benford Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation served on 12/27/2019. (Moore, Carlos)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Jason Homes, Timothy Jenkins, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, Dale Russell; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1749730, filed by Jacqueline Benford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benford v. Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jason Homes
Represented By: Farrah Noelle Winter Rifelj
Represented By: Henry Donald Brock, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt F. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation
Represented By: Farrah Noelle Winter Rifelj
Represented By: Henry Donald Brock, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt F. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Jenkins
Represented By: Farrah Noelle Winter Rifelj
Represented By: Henry Donald Brock, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt F. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Russell
Represented By: Farrah Noelle Winter Rifelj
Represented By: Henry Donald Brock, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt F. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Benford
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?