White v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Houston Andrew White
Defendant: Timothy Morris, Ricky Scott, Letha Williams, Verlena Flagg, Jerry Williams, Pelicia Hall, Lee Simon, Brenda Cox and Marshall Turner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00054
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #9 Order Spears Hearing set for 7/28/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 (jla)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 7/28/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/22/2020. (cb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Houston Andrew White. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb) Modified on 4/14/2020 (cb).
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline and Notice of Intent to Continue Lawsuit . (cb) Modified on 4/14/2020 (cb). Modified on 4/14/2020 (cb).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/2020. (cb)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 4/30/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2020. (cb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Houston Andrew White. (cb)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Houston Andrew White. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlena Flagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Andrew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?