Jones v. Horton et al
Plaintiff: Mary Katherine Horton Jones
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc., Phillip Horton, Sarah Horton and Regions Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv00095
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 Joinder in Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Joinder in Regions Bank's Reply in Support of Its Joinder in Fidelity's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc.. (Winningham, Donald)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration [Reply Brief in Support of #10 Joinder in the Motion to Compel Arbitration] filed by Regions Bank. (Masley, Stephen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc.. (Winningham, Donald)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion filed by Mary Katherine Horton Jones. (Swayze, Charles)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Mary Katherine Horton Jones. (Swayze, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 Response to Motion, filed by Mary Katherine Horton Jones. (Swayze, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Mary Katherine Horton Jones. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B) (Swayze, Charles)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 Joinder in the Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Fidelity re #4 MOTION to Compel filed by Regions Bank. (Masley, Stephen) Modified on 6/16/2020 (jla).
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration . (Masley, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Masley, Stephen)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE DUE TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATOIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/8/20. (bnd)
June 8, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (jwr)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued with Return on Sarah Horton, #4 Summons Issued with Return on Phillip Horton, #5 Summons Issued with Return on Fidelity, #6 Summons Issued with Return on Regions, #7 Entry of Appearance) (Masley, Stephen)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Winningham, Donald)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration . (Winningham, Donald)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Pending Arbitration by Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Winningham, Donald)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Defendant Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC's Consent and Joinder in Removal. (Winningham, Donald)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc., Phillip Horton, Sarah Horton, Regions Bank, filed by Mary Katherine Horton Jones. (tab)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regions Bank from Circuit Court of Leflore County, Mississippi, case number 2020-0016-CICI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1813941) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Regions Bank and Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Institutional Services, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Francis Winningham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Stephen T. Masley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Katherine Horton Jones
Represented By: Charles J. Swayze, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Jones Swayze, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?