EMI Staffing, Inc. v. Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.
Plaintiff: EMI Staffing, Inc.
Defendant: Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00096
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 7/30/2020. (irw)
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by David D. O'Donnell on behalf of Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc., Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc. to plaintiff. (O'Donnell, David)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 04:00 PM via TELE-CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Dial-in information listed on the notice. (irw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT of EMI Staffing against Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.,, filed by EMI Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EMI AND ICE CONTRACT, #2 Exhibit EMI Demand, #3 Exhibit EMI Acct. Receivable from ICE) (Powell, James)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/20/2020. (irw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 12/13/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 3/12/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/11/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/17/2020. (irw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 7/17/2020. (irw)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 EMI Staffing, Inc ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim of Grenada Stamping by EMI Staffing, Inc.. (Powell, James)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/17/2020. (irw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against EMI Staffing, Inc. by Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.. (O'Donnell, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Summons, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Fee Bill, #4 Exhibit D- State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit E- State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F- State Court Return on Summons) (O'Donnell, David)
June 8, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 State Court Record - Removal: Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 . (jwr)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record) (O'Donnell, David)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc., filed by EMI Staffing, Inc.. (jla)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc. from Grenada County Circuit Court, case number 2020-117CVM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1814128) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Ohio Corporation, #3 Exhibit C - Return on Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMI Staffing, Inc. v. Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grenada Stamping and Assembly, Inc.
Represented By: David D. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Powell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?