Roland v. Humphreys County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Wayne Roland
Defendant: Humphreys County, Mississippi, Deputy Dexter McPherson, Sheriff Charles Sharkey and Deputy Jeffery Jones
Case Number: 4:2020cv00111
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/20/20. (def)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #11 MOTION Referral to Jane M. Virden re #10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment and Motion for Default Judgment by Jerry Wayne Roland. (Atkinson, Boyd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION Referral to Jane M. Virden re #10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment by Jerry Wayne Roland. (Atkinson, Boyd)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/12/20. (jla)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Jerry Wayne Roland. (Atkinson, Boyd)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Humphreys County, Mississippi, Jeffery Jones, Dexter McPherson, Charles Sharkey (jla)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default by Jerry Wayne Roland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Atkinson, Boyd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default : Attorney to file affidavit in support of request as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). (jwr)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Jerry Wayne Roland. (Atkinson, Boyd)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Humphreys County, Mississippi, Sheriff Charles Sharkey, Deputy Dexter McPherson, and Deputy Jeffery Jones (jla)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boyd P. Atkinson on behalf of Jerry Wayne Roland All Defendants served 7/6/2020. (Atkinson, Boyd) Modified on 7/22/2020 (jwr).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Summons Returned Executed: Attorney to refile and include first page of summons. (jwr)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boyd P. Atkinson on behalf of Jerry Wayne Roland All Defendants. (Atkinson, Boyd)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney by mail for service. (jwr)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300026123, filed by Jerry Wayne Roland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roland v. Humphreys County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wayne Roland
Represented By: Boyd P. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humphreys County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Dexter McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Charles Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jeffery Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?