Fancher et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Fancher, Joann Walker and Bronson D. Thompson
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association and USAA Indemnity Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00123
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Christopher Gold. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/27/2021. (ck)
April 21, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Christopher Gold,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1938086) by Bronson D. Thompson. (Flanagan, Thomas)
April 1, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dinu S. Godage on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (Godage, Dinu)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/1/21. (jla)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Dinu S. Godage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/26/2021. (ck)
March 26, 2021 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION to Stay (In Support of Motion) filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
March 22, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Dinu S. Godage,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1923491) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reed, William)
March 19, 2021 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Stay (and Memorandum in Support of Motion [D.E. 69]) filed by Bronson D. Thompson. (Judkins, Amy)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Blythe K. Lollar terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/15/2021. (ck)
March 12, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Blythe K. Lollar) by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
March 10, 2021 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #68 MOTION to Stay . (Reed, William)
March 10, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION to Stay by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
March 8, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Amy L. Judkins on behalf of Bronson D. Thompson to Defendant. (Judkins, Amy)
March 8, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #66 Notice of Service; Attorney to include signature of local counsel on all filings as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)3. Attorney to refile with local counsel signature. (jla)
March 5, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service Pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 5(d)(3) by Amy L. Judkins on behalf of Bronson D. Thompson to Defendant. (Judkins, Amy)
March 3, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #65 Order to Show Cause - DISREGARD; document inadvertently filed in wrong case. (jtm)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/3/2021. (ck)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (ck)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (ck)
March 2, 2021 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Conference held on 3/2/2021. (irw)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion for Protective Order. No further order will issue from the court. (No document is attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (ck)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #41 Motion Motion to Approve and Enter Proposed ESI Discovery Protocol. No further order will issue from the court. (No document is attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (ck)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Martina Ellerbe is terminated. No further order will issue from the court. (No document is attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (ck)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER governs class certification issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (irw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Call-in information provided on the notice. (irw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
February 26, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION for Protective Order by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Amy L. Judkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/9/2021. (ck)
February 5, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Amy L. Judkins,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1905127) by Bronson D. Thompson. (Flanagan, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 51 Joint Oral Motion for 30 day stay of entry of CMO and commencement of discovery from the date of this entry. No further order will issue from the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/2/2021. (ck)
February 2, 2021 Filing 51 JOINT ORAL MOTION for 30-day stay of entry of CMO and commencement of discovery from the date of this entry. (ck)
February 2, 2021 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 2/2/2021. (irw)
February 1, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:00 AM in Greenville Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Call-in information provided on the notice. (irw)
January 11, 2021 Filing 48 Response to #42 Objection, #39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United Services Automobile Association . (Reed, William)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #40 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/7/21. (bfg)
January 7, 2021 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Conference held on 1/7/2021. (irw)
January 6, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 Objection; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response now due on or before January 11, 2021. No further order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/5/2021. (no document attached) (sko)
January 4, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 Objection re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Reed, William) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jla).
January 4, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Conference:Telephonic Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Greenville Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Dial-in information provided on the notice. (irw)
December 30, 2020 Filing 42 Objection to #39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United Services Automobile Association . (Normand, Edmund)
December 22, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #40 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , #41 Joint MOTION to Approve and Enter Proposed ESI Discovery Protocol ; Section 5(B) of Administrative Procedures for ECF states proposed orders are not to be filed as an attachment to a pleading; attorney to email proposed order to chambers. (jla)
December 18, 2020 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Approve and Enter Proposed ESI Discovery Protocol by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Order Establishing Protocol) (Reed, William)
December 18, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Confidentiality and Protective Order) (Reed, William)
December 16, 2020 Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United Services Automobile Association. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/16/20. (bfg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal [Amended Joint] of USAA General Indemnity Company. (Normand, Edmund)
December 11, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal [Joint] of USAA General Indemnity Company. (Normand, Edmund)
December 1, 2020 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Conference held on 12/1/2020. (irw) (Main Document 36 replaced on 12/2/2020) (irw). Modified on 12/8/2020 (jla).
December 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 04:00 PM via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Dial-in information provided in the notice. (irw)
November 18, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2020. (irw)
November 17, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Withdrawal, #2 Exhibit B - Dismissal) (Reed, William)
November 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw) (Main Document 32 replaced on 11/16/2020) (irw).
November 11, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Bronson D. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Normand, Edmund)
November 10, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT Regarding Jurisdiction filed by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2020. (irw)
November 3, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy) (Reed, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal MOTION to Stay Proceedings . (Reed, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Appraisal Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit B-2 - Response to Appraisal Demand Letter) (Reed, William)
October 19, 2020 NOTICE of Conference: #20 Case Management Conference RESET for 11/5/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United Services Automobile Association answer due 11/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/19/20. (bfg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint by United Services Automobile Association. (Reed, William)
October 14, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Parties [Lauren Fancher and Joann Walker]. (Normand, Edmund)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE STATEMENT (Corporate Disclosure Statement). (Reed, William)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Lauren Fancher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy) (Flanagan, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/1/2020. (irw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lauren Fancher, Joann Walker by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fancher Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Walker Policy) (Reed, William)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or file Other Responsive Pleading. USAA Casualty Insurance Company answer due 9/30/2020; USAA General Indemnity Company answer due 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/25/20. (bfg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Reed, William)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Edmund A. Normand. Attorney Normand shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/11/20. (bfg) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/11/2020) (irw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Edmund A. Normand,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1838113) by Lauren Fancher. (Flanagan, Thomas)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Matthew Drocton. Attorney Drocton shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/10/20. (bfg)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Martina Ellerbe. Attorney Ellerbe shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/10/20. (bfg)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Rand McClellan. Attorney McClellan shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/6/20. (bfg)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Rodger Lee Eckelberry. Attorney Eckelberry shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/6/20. (bfg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Matthew Drocton,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1836680) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Reed, William)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Martina Ellerbe,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1836617) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Reed, William)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Rand McClellan,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1836054) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Certficate of Good Standing) (Reed, William)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Rodger Lee Eckelberry,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1836049) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Reed, William)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blythe K. Lollar on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company (Lollar, Blythe)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE STATEMENT of USAA Casualty Insurance Company and USAA General Indemnity Company. (Reed, William)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William N. Reed on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company (Reed, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; All Defendants. (Flanagan, Thomas)
July 9, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1826625, filed by Lauren Fancher, Joann Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fancher et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Fancher
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan, Jr.
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Walker
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan, Jr.
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronson D. Thompson
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan, Jr.
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Represented By: Amy L. Judkins
Represented By: Christopher Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew G. Drocton
Represented By: Martina Ellerbe
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand McClellan
Represented By: William N. Reed
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Represented By: Dinu S. Godage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Matthew G. Drocton
Represented By: Martina Ellerbe
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand McClellan
Represented By: William N. Reed
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Represented By: Dinu S. Godage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: William N. Reed
Represented By: Dinu S. Godage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Indemnity Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?