Coleman v. Morris et al
Plaintiff: Wilbert Coleman
Defendant: Timothy Morris, Warden Unknown Siamon, Unknown Mathis, "Unknown" William, "Unknown" Simmons, Unknown Menferd, Captain "Unknown" Meeks, Marshall Turnner, Unknown Thickpen and "Unknown" Smith
Case Number: 4:2020cv00126
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel. (cb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel . (cb) Modified on 9/10/2020 (cb).
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel by Wilbert Coleman. (cb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #12 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #11 Order GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. (cb)
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Spears Hearing set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/1/2020. (cb) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/1/2020) (cb). Modified on 9/1/2020 (cb). (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/1/2020) (cb).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/21/2020. (cb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBIT Affidavit re #9 MOTION for service to be issued. (cb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for service to be issued by Wilbert Coleman. (cb) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/13/2020) (cb).
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #6 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wilbert Coleman. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 8/17/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/20. (jla)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00299. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 13, 2020 Remark : Order Transferring Case #3 Order emailed to IT Department to electronically transfer case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi. Clerk will docket confirmation email when received from the Northern District of Mississippi. (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI. ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), this civil action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court of the Northern District of Mississippi, and all documents filed in this civil action shall be received in accordance with the local rules of the Northern District of Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 7/10/2020 (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 District Transfer Out to the Northern District of Mississippi. (VM) Modified on 7/13/2020 (VM). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/16/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wilbert Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/16/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Morris, Unknown Mathis, Unknown Meeks, Unknown Menferd, Unknown Siamon, Unknown Simmons, Unknown Smith, Unknown Thickpen, Marshall Turnner, Unknown William, filed by Wilbert Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Unknown Siamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Unknown" William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Unknown" Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Menferd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain "Unknown" Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Turnner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thickpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Unknown" Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?