Pringle v. Metal Craft Building Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Henry Pringle
Defendant: Helena Chemical Company and Metal Craft Building Systems, Inc.
Garnishee: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00129
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Dan W. Webb on behalf of Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company of Supplementation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment) (Webb, Dan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order) (Webb, Dan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order) (Webb, Dan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Dan W. Webb on behalf of Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company of Filing of Affidavit and Ratification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit and Ratification) (Webb, Dan)
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss ; Responses due by 9/17/2020, #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Summary Judgment; Replies due by 9/10/2020. (jla)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/26/20. (bds)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss (unopposed) by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Webb, Dan) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jla).
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 Response to Motion re #6 for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Summary Judgment (Panter, S.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jla).
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Summary Judgment filed by Henry Pringle. (Panter, S.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jla).
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Henry Pringle. (Panter, S.)
August 20, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 Brief; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Summary Judgment filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Webb, Dan) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jla).
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative Summary Judgment by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Webb, Dan) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jla).
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (jla)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Humphreys County Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Doc 1 - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Doc 2- State Court Summons Issued to Metal Craft and to Helena Chemical, #4 Exhibit Doc 3 - State Court Complaint with Discovery, #5 Exhibit Doc 4 - Summons Returned served on Metal Craft, #6 Exhibit Doc 5- Amended Complaint to Helena Chemical, #7 Exhibit Doc 6 - Summons Returned served on Helena Chemical, #8 Exhibit Doc 7 - Answer of Helena Chemical, #9 Exhibit Doc 62 - Agreed Order of Dismissal as to Helena Chemical, #10 Exhibit Doc 63 - Application for Default and Supporting Affidavit regarding Metal Craft, #11 Exhibit Doc 64 - Entry of Default Against Metal Craft, #12 Exhibit Doc 65 - Motion for Default Judgment re Metal Craft, #13 Exhibit Doc 66- Order Granting Default Judgment Against Metal Craft, #14 Exhibit Doc 67 - Notice of Hearing on Default Judgment, #15 Exhibit Doc 68 - Final Judgment Against Metal Craft, #16 Exhibit Doc 69 - Subpoena Duces Tecum to Endurance, #17 Exhibit Doc 70 - Proof of Service of SDT to Endurance, #18 Exhibit Doc 71 - Motion to Compel Compliance with SDT, #19 Exhibit Doc 72 - Suggestion for Writ of Garnishment to Endurance, #20 Exhibit Doc 73 - Writ of Garnishment to Endurance, #21 Exhibit Doc 74 - Notice of Appearance of Webb for Endurance, #22 Exhibit Doc 75 - Answer to Writ of Garnishment of Endurance, #23 Exhibit Doc 76 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Webb, Dan)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Metal Craft Building Systems, Inc.; filed in state court (jla)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT with discovery attached against Helena Chemical Company, Metal Craft Building Systems, Inc., filed by Henry Pringle. (tab)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Humphreys County, Mississippi, case number 2017-0021. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1829868) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Suggestion for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Exhibit B Writ of Garnishment, #3 Exhibit C Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D Company Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Metal Craft Building Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Represented By: Brandi Elizabeth Soper
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Pringle
Represented By: Joe Nathan Tatum
Represented By: S. Craig Panter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Craft Building Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?