Logan v. State of Mississippi
Petitioner: Courtney R. Logan
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00144
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number MSN300026709 (jwr)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; filing fee must be paid within 21 days or this action may be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/30/20. (jla)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Courtney R. Logan. (cb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 ORDER requiring the Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information within 30 days. (cb) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/27/2020) (cb).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring the Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/18/2020. (cb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/18/2020) (cb).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (cb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Leflore County ) filed by Courtney R. Logan. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Courtney R. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?