Ables v. Knighten et al
Plaintiff: Jon J. Ables
Defendant: Angela Brown, Centurion of MS, LLC, Vicky Thomas and Willie Knighten
Case Number: 4:2020cv00154
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Spears Hearing held on 10/27/2020 *Audio Recorded during Proceeding. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 Corrected Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Jon J. Ables for October 27, 2020. (rtc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Jon J. Ables for October 27, 2020. (rtc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Spears Hearing RESET for 10/27/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 10/30/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee of $74.08, with Remaining Payments to be made as Directed in Order. (cb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 10/30/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy.Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/23/2020. (cb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee of $74.08, with Remaining Payments to be made as Directed in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/23/2020. (cb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/23/2020) (cb).
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline and NOTICE OF INTENT to Continue Lawsuit. (jla)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jla)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2020. (cb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jon J. Ables. (cb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/3/2020) (cb).
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Jon J. Ables. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ables v. Knighten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of MS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Knighten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon J. Ables
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?