Granderson v. Mississippi Valley State University et al
Plaintiff: Alex Granderson
Defendant: Dr. Jerryl Briggs, Elizabeth Hurssey, Mississippi Valley State University, Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly and Ficticious Defendant, X, Y and Z
Case Number: 4:2020cv00160
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/29/2020. (irw)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Jerryl Briggs, Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly, Elizabeth Hurssey, Mississippi Valley State University. (Alexander, Amanda)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jerryl Briggs's answer due 10/28/2020; Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly's answer due 10/28/2020; Elizabeth Hurssey's answer due 10/28/2020; Mississippi Valley State University's answer due 10/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/6/20. (ncb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Jerryl Briggs, Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly, Elizabeth Hurssey, Mississippi Valley State University. (Alexander, Amanda)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Green Alexander on behalf of Jerryl Briggs, Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly, Elizabeth Hurssey, Mississippi Valley State University (Alexander, Amanda)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John M. Mooney, Jr on behalf of Alex Granderson Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly served on 9/24/2020. (Mooney, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John M. Mooney, Jr on behalf of Alex Granderson Mississippi Valley State University served on 9/22/2020. (Mooney, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John M. Mooney, Jr on behalf of Alex Granderson Elizabeth Hurssey served on 9/17/2020. (Mooney, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John M. Mooney, Jr on behalf of Alex Granderson Jerryl Briggs served on 9/17/2020. (Mooney, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Jerryl Briggs, Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly, Elizabeth Hurssey, Mississippi Valley State University; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Alex Granderson against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Alex Granderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MVSU Grievance Policy, #2 Exhibit MVSU Letter to Plaintiff from MVSU, #3 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff's attorney from MVSU) (Mooney, John)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jerryl Briggs, Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly, Elizabeth Hurssey, Mississippi Valley State University; emailed to attorney for service. (jla)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1849272, filed by Alex Granderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MSVU Grievance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - MVSU Letter to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Pla's Attorney from MVSU, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granderson v. Mississippi Valley State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Granderson
Represented By: John M. Mooney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jerryl Briggs
Represented By: Amanda Green Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hurssey
Represented By: Amanda Green Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Valley State University
Represented By: Amanda Green Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Gibson-Preastly
Represented By: Amanda Green Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ficticious Defendant, X, Y and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?