Walker et al v. Warrington et al
Plaintiff: Walker Roxanne, Rasheeda Walker and Roxanne Walker
Defendant: Delta Medical Care Foundation, Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation, Warrington Clinic doing business as Clarksdale Family Medical Center, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL NORTH MS, United Emergency Services, Inc., James E. Warrington, Sr., John Doe Defendants, I-X, Kristina L. Loprinzi and Patrick Louis Carr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00201
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CORPORATE STATEMENT Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc.. (Carmody, Leo)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Delta Medical Foundation. (Williams, Tommie)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Stay re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) filed by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Carmody, Leo)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) filed by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Carmody, Leo)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to United Emergency Services, Inc. (jla)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Stay re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) filed by Rasheeda Walker. (Blackmon, Edward)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) filed by Rasheeda Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A:June 5, 2020 - Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit B: Baptist Hospital Locations, #3 Exhibit C: Merger with Mississippi Baptist Health) (Blackmon, Edward)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tommie Gregory Williams on behalf of Delta Medical Care Foundation, Kristina L. Loprinzi, James E. Warrington, Sr (Williams, Tommie)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #20 MOTION to Stay re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) filed by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Carmody, Leo)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Stay re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Carmody, Leo)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) filed by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Carmody, Leo)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Miss. Code Ann. Section 15-1-36(15) by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit SOS Filing - BMH-NM, #3 Exhibit SOS Filing - Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation) (Carmody, Leo)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Blackmon, Jr on behalf of Rasheeda Walker, Roxanne Walker Patrick Louis Carr served on 12/3/2020. (Blackmon, Edward)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr on behalf of Delta Medical Care Foundation, James E. Warrington, Sr Subpoena to Produce Documents to Clarksdale Pharmacy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - SDT) (Williams, Tommie)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Blackmon, Jr on behalf of Rasheeda Walker, Roxanne Walker Warrington Clinic served on 12/21/2020. (Blackmon, Edward)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. (Carmody, Leo)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Warrington Clinic and Patrick Louis Carr (jla)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Kristina L. Loprinzi. (Williams, Tommie)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Blackmon, Jr on behalf of Rasheeda Walker, Roxanne Walker United Emergency Services, Inc. served on 12/3/2020. (Blackmon, Edward)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Blackmon, Jr on behalf of Rasheeda Walker, Roxanne Walker Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS served on 12/3/2020. (Blackmon, Edward)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr on behalf of Delta Medical Care Foundation, James E. Warrington, Sr of Issuance of SDT to Haire Drug Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - SDT to Haire Drug Center) (Williams, Tommie)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr on behalf of Delta Medical Care Foundation to Plaintiffs. (Williams, Tommie)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Delta Medical Care Foundation, James E. Warrington, Sr. (Williams, Tommie)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Blackmon, Jr on behalf of Roxanne Walker, Rasheeda Walker James E. Warrington, Sr served on 11/25/2020. (Blackmon, Edward)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Blackmon, Jr on behalf of Roxanne Walker, Rasheeda Walker Delta Medical Care Foundation served on 11/25/2020. (Blackmon, Edward)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab) Modified on 11/19/2020 (jwr).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patrick Louis Carr, Delta Medical Care Foundation, John Doe Defendants, I-X, Kristina L. Loprinzi, United Emergency Services, Inc., James E. Warrington, Sr, Warrington Clinic, Baptist Memorial Hospital North MS, Jury Demand, filed by Roxanne Walker, Rasheeda Walker. (Blackmon, Edward)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation, Patrick Louis Carr, Delta Medical Care Foundation, Kristina L. Loprinzi, United Emergency Services, Inc., James E. Warrington, Sr, Warrington Clinic. Returned to attorney via mail for service. (jwr)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300026906, filed by Roxanne Walker, Rasheeda Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Warrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Medical Care Foundation
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warrington Clinic doing business as Clarksdale Family Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL NORTH MS
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Emergency Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Warrington, Sr.
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants, I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina L. Loprinzi
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Louis Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker Roxanne
Represented By: Edward Blackmon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheeda Walker
Represented By: Edward Blackmon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Walker
Represented By: Edward Blackmon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?